Arun kumar singh ias
Web25 giu 2024 · H Arun Kumar IAS. Shri H Arun Kumar IAS (Andhra Pradesh 2004) presently Special Commissioner, Women Development and Child Welfare , has been transferred and posted as Special Commissioner, Agriculture, vice Sri Pravin Kumar IAS (Andhra Pradesh 2006).. Indian Bureaucracy Dot Com wishes Shri H Arun Kumar the … Web1 gen 2024 · Shri Sukhdeo Singh Id No. 039400 24/08/1987;RR singhs16: 05/03/1964 1987;JH Haryana 56 Years: 3: Shri Arun Kumar Singh Id No. 040600 25/08/1988;RR singhak1: 07/12/1963 1988;JH Rajasthan 57 Years: 4: Shri Lalbiaktlunga Khiangte Id No. 040300 26/08/1988;RR khiangte: 26/10/1964 1988;JH Mizoram
Arun kumar singh ias
Did you know?
http://www.jcsoi.org/doctor/sri-arun-kumar-singh/
Web7 giu 2024 · June 7, 2024. Shri Arun Kumar Singh IAS (Jharkhand 1988) presently additional Chief Secretary of Urban Development and Housing Department and also hold … Websri arun kumar singh : principal secretary ,forest & environment department, jharkhand, ranchi — — 16: sri satendra singh : on foreign training: 9934111171: …
WebRT @suryapsingh_IAS: एनकाउंटर में मारे गए अपराधियों के प्रति कोई संवेदना नहीं। …लेकिन ‘फ़ेक’ एनकाउंटर,न्याय व्यवस्था पर कुठाराघात है,दम है तो अपराधी को पकड़िये ... WebAmbassador Arun K. Singh served as Ambassador of India to the United States from April 30, 2015 to August 31 2016, having served earlier as Deputy Chief of Mission from October 2008 to April 2013. During his tenures (spanning the Obama presidency and following the signing of the Indo-U.S. Civil Nuclear Agreement), the relationship between India and the …
Web2 giorni fa · The Punjab government has transferred 1997 batch IPS officer Arun Pal Singh of Punjab cadre, ADGP (Modernisation), and posted him as ADGP, Jails, Punjab, in place of B Chandra Sekhar IPS. B Chandra Sekhar IPS has been directed to report to DGP, Punjab. His posting orders will be issued separately. Share this article.
Web9 ago 2024 · Updated: 09 Aug 2024, 02:04 PM IST PTI. Anant Singh, a 1984 batch IAS officer of the UP cadre, was appointed secretary, Ministry of Textiles, in May last year. Photo: textiles ministry via Twitter ... rechargeable lights for closetsWeb1 mar 2024 · The Government of Bihar, on February 28, issued official orders and appointed Arun Kumar Singh (IAS 1985-Batch) as the new Chief Secretary of Bihar. Singh will … unlimited download musicWebView ARUN KUMAR’S professional profile on LinkedIn. ... Sahibzada Ajit Singh Nagar, Punjab, India. 24 followers 23 connections. ... Department of Financial Services, Ministry of Finance. #ias Liked by ARUN KUMAR. Please remember to support the Most Ancient Language of Our Planet - "SANSKRIT". It is Our language, ... rechargeable lights at makroWeb9 apr 2024 · Singh is the second nominee of the Adani group to have resigned from the NDTV board. On March 9, NDTV, in a stock exchange filing, stated that Sunil Kumar has resigned as an additional non-executive independent director of the company. Kumar, a 1979-batch IAS officer, was chief secretary in Chhattisgarh from 2012 to 2014. unlimited download movieWeb11 apr 2024 · LO Bureau. -. April 11, 2024. 0. The Punjab government has transferred Arun Pal Singh (IPS:1997:PB), ADGP (Modernisation), and posted him as ADGP, Jails, … rechargeable lights for constructionWebIndian Administrative Service (IAS) - Government of India Jul 1999 - Present23 years 10 months Managing Director FDDI Jul 2024 - Dec … rechargeable lights build itWeb22 giu 2024 · Arun Kumar Sinha IAS empanelment as Joint Secretary, GoI. August 30, 2024. Shri Arun Kumar Sinha IAS (Manipur 1999) presently Managing Director, … unlimiteddownloads.net